+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Died in Process
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Appropriation Bill Transmittal
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Not Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Natural Resources
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Natural Resources
- Hearing scheduled in committee Natural Resources on 02/24/2021
- Amendments Available
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee Local Government on 02/19/2021
- Rereferred to Committee Natural Resources
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Local Government
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 13, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 28, 2020 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 2, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor