+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (52)
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
- Chapter Number Assigned
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Returned to House with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Rereferred to Committee
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 2, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On December 7, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On December 1, 2016 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On November 22, 2016 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 15, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Draft in Edit
On October 28, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On October 24, 2016 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On June 13, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor