+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
- Hearing Canceled
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Not Heard at Sponsor's Request
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 19, 2013 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 31, 2012 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 17, 2012 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor