+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
- Tabled in Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Hearing Canceled
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 31, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On January 5, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 6, 2014 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 5, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor