+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (49)
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Printed - New Version Available
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Sponsors Engrossed
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Legal Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
April 13, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 4
April 12, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
April 9, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
February 27, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
February 26, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 4
February 21, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Jeffrey W Welborn
Type:
Primary Sponsor