+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (40)
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Process
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed
- 2nd Reading Concur Motion Failed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to Senate
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- 2nd Reading Passed as Amended
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced
- First Reading
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 19, 2016 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 5, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor