+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (39)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee Public Health, Welfare and Safety
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee Public Health, Welfare and Safety
- Hearing scheduled in committee Public Health, Welfare and Safety on 04/08/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee Public Health, Welfare and Safety on 04/03/2019
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Public Health, Welfare and Safety
- First Reading
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Appropriations
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Appropriations
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Appropriations on 03/15/2019
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee Appropriations on 02/22/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee Appropriations
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Human Services
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Human Services
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Human Services on 02/11/2019
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Human Services
- Introduced
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft Back for Redo
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Kimberly Dudik
Type:
Primary Sponsor