+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 29, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On October 29, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor