+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (63)
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 13, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Highways and Transportation
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Highways and Transportation
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Highways and Transportation on 03/21/2019
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Highways and Transportation
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Appropriations
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Appropriations
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
- Hearing scheduled in committee Appropriations on 02/27/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee Appropriations
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Transportation
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Transportation
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Transportation on 02/13/2019
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Transportation
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 19, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft Back for Redo
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 14, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Joshua Kassmier
Type:
Primary Sponsor