+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to House
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sponsors Engrossed
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to Senate
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 29, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 31, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
March 28, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 14
March 26, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
March 23, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 6
February 23, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
February 22, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 31
- Absent: 1
February 17, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor