+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Printed - New Version Available
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 29, 2014 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 11, 2014 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On December 5, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
March 16, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 3
March 13, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 49
- Present/NV: 1
March 10, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 11
February 17, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 100
February 16, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 1
February 12, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 22
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor