+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (46)
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Edit
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 6, 2016 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 3, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor