+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (32)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee State Administration
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee State Administration
- Hearing scheduled in committee State Administration on 04/09/2021
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee State Administration
- First Reading
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Judiciary
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Judiciary
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 03/10/2021
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On February 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On January 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor