+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 2, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to Senate
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On January 14, 2011 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 8, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 5, 2010 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (8)
April 4, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 1
April 2, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 1
March 17, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 5
March 16, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 4
March 11, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 8
February 22, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 2
February 21, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 1
February 17, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor