+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (60)
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- 2nd Reading Passed
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Rereferred to Committee
- 2nd Reading Passed
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On February 12, 2011 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 22, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (8)
April 13, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 7
April 12, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 6
April 6, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 4
March 25, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 3
March 24, 2011: Do Pass As Amended
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 7
March 24, 2011: AMD-002 Hiner D/PASS
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
February 21, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 22
February 11, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor