+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (58)
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 13, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs on 04/02/2019
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- First Reading
On March 23, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Appropriations
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Appropriations
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Appropriations on 03/18/2019
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Rereferred to Committee Appropriations
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Business and Labor
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Business and Labor
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business and Labor on 02/21/2019
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee Taxation on 02/06/2019
- Rereferred to Committee Business and Labor
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Referred to Committee Taxation
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 20, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Ross H Fitzgerald
Type:
Primary Sponsor