+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 28, 2017 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 29, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor