+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
On March 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Sponsors Engrossed
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 16, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 2, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced
- Referred to Committee
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
On January 27, 2013 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 11, 2012 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
March 16, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 5
March 15, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 10
February 18, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
February 16, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 1
February 13, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor