+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs on 03/18/2021
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- First Reading
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Human Services
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Human Services
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Human Services on 02/19/2021
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Human Services
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor