+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Sponsors Engrossed
- Printed - New Version Available
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 19, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
- Fiscal Note Signed
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 6, 2010 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 5, 2010 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
March 9, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 50
March 8, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 3
March 4, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 11
February 19, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
February 18, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 100
February 16, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor