+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Died in Process
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Not Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Judiciary
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Judiciary
- Taken from Table in Committee Judiciary
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Judiciary
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 02/25/2021
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Amendments Available
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
- First Reading
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 31, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor