+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Withdrawn per House Rule H30-50(3)(b)
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On December 13, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor