+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 5, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor