+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Process
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Judiciary
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 02/18/2019
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Mike Hopkins
Type:
Primary Sponsor