+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (58)
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - New Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 20, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Free Conference Committee Report Received
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Free Conference Committee Report Received
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
- Free Conference Committee Appointed
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Free Conference Committee Appointed
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (11)
April 23, 2013: Do Adopt Free Conf Comm Rpt
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 2
April 22, 2013: Do Adopt Free Conf Comm Report
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
April 20, 2013: Do Adopt FC Report
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 3
April 19, 2013: Do Adopt FC Report
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 5
April 15, 2013: Do Not Concur with SA
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 36
April 8, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 50
April 6, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 50
April 4, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 12
February 19, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
February 18, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 1
February 13, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor