+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (52)
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to House with Amendments
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 28, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 5, 2010 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (8)
April 5, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 43
- Present/NV: 1
April 4, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 36
- Absent: 1
March 25, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 17
March 24, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 15, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 10
February 15, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 41
- Absent: 2
February 14, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 46
- Absent: 1
February 8, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor