+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (34)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Died in Process
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee State Administration
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Requested
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
- Hearing scheduled in committee State Administration on 02/16/2021
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor List Modified
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee State Administration
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Fiscal Note Requested
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 16, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 1, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 30, 2020 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 19, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor