+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (47)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Judiciary
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Judiciary
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 03/13/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
- First Reading
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Judiciary
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Judiciary
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 02/07/2019
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Sponsor List Modified
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
- Introduced
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Executive Director Final Review
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On November 28, 2018 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On November 26, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
John Fuller
Type:
Primary Sponsor