+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Returned to House with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Hearing
On February 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (8)
March 23, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 32
- Present/NV: 1
March 20, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 12
March 13, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 49
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 49
- Present/NV: 1
March 9, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
February 12, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 19
February 11, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 25
February 4, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor