+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Died in Process
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Business and Labor
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Amendments Available
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business and Labor on 02/12/2021
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Business and Labor
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Executive Director Review
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Back for Requester Changes
On December 23, 2020 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 10, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor