+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Appropriation Bill Transmittal
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 24, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 29, 2014 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 3, 2014 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On November 6, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor