+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Process
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee State Administration
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee State Administration on 02/14/2019
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee State Administration on 02/01/2019
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee State Administration
On January 26, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On December 19, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
On December 4, 2018 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On December 3, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
On November 30, 2018 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 20, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On November 16, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On November 14, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On November 2, 2018 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On September 10, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Jacob Bachmeier
Type:
Primary Sponsor