+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (73)
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
- Chapter Number Assigned
On April 25, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to House Concurred in Governor's Proposed Amendments
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments
- 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 18, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to House
On March 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 21, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Taken from Table in Committee
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee
- Hearing Canceled
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On January 31, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 24, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On December 22, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 19, 2014 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 16, 2014 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 19, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (10)
April 23, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 18
April 22, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 15
April 20, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 32
- Absent: 1
April 18, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 32
March 23, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 1
March 21, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
March 17, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
February 23, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 31
- Present/NV: 2
February 21, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 23
- Absent: 1
February 20, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor