+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 29, 2011 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Printed - New Version Available
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Sponsors Engrossed
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On April 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Taken from Table in Committee
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 14, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 30, 2010 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 13, 2010 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 2, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
April 13, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 20
April 12, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 19
April 8, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 18, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 1
February 17, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 30
- Absent: 1
February 14, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor