+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Process
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Education
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Education on 02/04/2019
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Education
- Fiscal Note Requested
On January 26, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 5, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
On January 4, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 20, 2018 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On November 28, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Greg DeVries
Type:
Primary Sponsor