+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
- Hearing
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On December 14, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor