+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On February 7, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 9, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On January 6, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 24, 2014 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 5, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (3)
February 7, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 44
- Present/NV: 1
February 6, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 42
February 3, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor