+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (34)
On November 24, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On November 16, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On November 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On November 16, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
- Sent to Enrolling
On November 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On November 16, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On November 15, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On November 13, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
- First Reading
On November 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On November 8, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Assembly
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On November 7, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 6, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor