+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (67)
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Printed - New Version Available
- Hearing
- Rereferred to Committee
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 25, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Printed - New Version Available
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Fiscal Note Requested
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor