+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (64)
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report Received
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report Received
- Hearing
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Appointed
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Conference Committee Appointed
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 2, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Pass Consideration
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Printed - New Version Available
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Hearing
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Hearing
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- First Reading
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 15, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On January 14, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 5, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (11)
April 18, 2011: Do Adopt
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
April 18, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 1
April 13, 2011: Do Adopt
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 2
April 13, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 50
April 4, 2011: Do Not Concur
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 2
March 28, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 1
March 26, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 23, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 8
February 8, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 1
February 7, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
February 3, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 18
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor