+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (56)
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to House with Amendments
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Hearing
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to Senate
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 8, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On December 28, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Back for Requester Changes
On December 14, 2010 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On October 26, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (8)
April 18, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 45
- Present/NV: 1
April 13, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 13
April 13, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 40
April 12, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 12
April 7, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 4
March 25, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 39
- Present/NV: 3
March 24, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 42
March 21, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsor
Jon C Sesso
Type:
Primary Sponsor