+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Hearing
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 27, 2012 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 5, 2012 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor