+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (55)
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Clerical Corrections Made - New Version Available
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On February 21, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On February 7, 2015 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 5, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 4, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On January 2, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 31, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On December 30, 2014 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 22, 2014 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 5, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (7)
March 30, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 1
March 28, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 3
March 25, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 21, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 43
February 19, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 4
February 6, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 43
February 4, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor