+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (65)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report Received
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report Received
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Appointed
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Appointed
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor List Modified
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 7, 2017 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 15, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor