+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
- Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in Committee
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Not Passed
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On January 18, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 5, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Vote
February 20, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Not Passed
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor