+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (52)
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 21, 2015 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee
- Hearing Canceled
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 5, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 9, 2014 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Referred to Committee
On December 1, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On November 10, 2014 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On October 28, 2014 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On October 27, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On October 24, 2014 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On October 1, 2014 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On June 25, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
February 17, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 6
February 12, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 2
January 29, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 6
January 28, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 8
January 22, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor