+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Died in Process
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Not Passed
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Education
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Education
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Amendments Available
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Education on 01/11/2021
On January 4, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee Education
On December 13, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On November 30, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
On November 27, 2020 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 24, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On November 17, 2020 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On November 2, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On October 16, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On August 25, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor