+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Process
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Business and Labor
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business and Labor on 01/31/2019
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Business and Labor
- Introduced
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 3, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Jacob Bachmeier
Type:
Primary Sponsor