+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (35)
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Vote Failed; Remains in Committee
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 24, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Requested
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
On January 5, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
- First Reading
On December 9, 2014 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Referred to Committee
On November 24, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On November 10, 2014 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On October 7, 2014 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On September 11, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On September 8, 2014 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On September 5, 2014 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (3)
January 26, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 39
- Present/NV: 1
January 24, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 36
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor