+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
- Draft in Edit
On January 6, 2017 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 30, 2016 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 15, 2016 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On December 7, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 5, 2016 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On November 21, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor